Smith, Barry Jay (CPSO#: 84501)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Greenbelt Family Health Team
3500 Fallowfield Road
Ottawa ON  K2J 4A7
Phone: (613) 843-1718
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Quinte Health Care Belleville
1-H Manor Lane
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0
Canada
Phone: (613) 332-2825
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Almonte General Hospital
75 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Canada
Phone: (613) 256-2500
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Barry Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 26 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Smith ( CPSO# 84501 )

Business Address:
Almonte General Hospital
75 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone Number: (613) 256-2500

Business Address:
Quinte Health Care Belleville General
1-H Manor Lane
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0
Phone Number: (613) 332-2825

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings,Bancroft Bancroft

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARRY JAY SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2009