Smith, Benjamin Marshall (CPSO#: 86084)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 506 - 3027 Harvester Rd
Burlington ON  L7N 3G7
Phone: (905) 333-5100 Ext. 3
Fax: (905) 333-5107
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Benjamin Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Smith ( CPSO# 86084 )

Business Address:
Unit 506
3027 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3G7
Phone Number: (905) 333-5100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BENJAMIN MARSHALL SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 16 Apr 2007 to 09 May 2007
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2008