Smith, Beverley Jean (CPSO#: 51786)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Oct 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017