Smith, Bryan Vincent (CPSO#: 33605)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 1982

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-4842
Fax: (613) 721-4785
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bryan Vincent Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Smith ( CPSO# 33605 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-4842

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  July 8, 2014
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On July 14, 2014, Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital notified the College that Dr. B.V. Smith's privileges were voluntarily restricted.

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  June 26, 2014
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On July 2, 2014, Queensway Carleton Hospital notified the College that Dr. B.V. Smith's privileges were voluntarily restricted.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRYAN VINCENT SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1982