Smith, Carol Ada (CPSO#: 32666)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Workplace Safety & Insurance Board of Ontario
Date Received: 22 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist
Occupational Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015