Smith, Charles Douglas (CPSO#: 29530)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Arthritis Centre
The Ottawa Hospital Riverside
Campus
1967 Riverside Drive Box 37
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 81840
Fax: (613) 738-8336
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Douglas Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Smith ( CPSO# 29530 )

Business Address:
The Arthritis Centre
The Ottawa Hospital Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive Room 6-34
PO Box 37
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 738-8400

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 09 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES DOUGLAS SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1977