Smith, David Gerald (CPSO#: 55676)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7750 Bayview Ave.
Thornhill ON  L3T 4A3
Phone: (905) 889-1125
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 28 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID GERALD SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1987