Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Smith, David Howard (CPSO#: 65417)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Oct 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia
London Health Sciences Centre
West Campus
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dr. Jeffrey H Richmond, Dentistry
339 Westminster Avenue
London, Ontario
London ON  N6C-4V3
Canada
Phone: 519-858-8370
Fax: 519-858-8375
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Howard Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 12 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Smith ( CPSO# 65417 )

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8525

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6185

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5

Business Address:
339 Westminster Avenue
2nd Floor
London ON  N6C 4V3
Phone Number: (519) 858-8370

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID HOWARD SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1992