Smith, Dean Alexander (CPSO#: 55492)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sussex Centre
Unit 101
50 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Mississauga ON  L5B 3C2
Phone: (905) 897 2020
Fax: (905) 270-8669
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dean A. Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 03 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Smith ( CPSO# 55492 )

Business Address:
101 - 50 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Mississauga ON  L5B 3C2
Phone Number: (905) 848-9562

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 16 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEAN ALEXANDER SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1988