Smith, Dean Frederick (CPSO#: 55587)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 15 Dec 1988 RCPSC Specialist
General Pathology Effective: 13 Dec 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jul 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2002