Smith, Donald Harland (CPSO#: 13826)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Aug 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1952

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1952
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 1999
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Aug 2015

Concerns

Source: Executive Committee
Active Date: August 10, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. DONALD HARLAND SMITH
(“Dr. Smith”)

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)


A. PREAMBLE

(1) I, Dr. Smith, certificate of registration number 13826, have been a member of the
College since 1952. The College has received information regarding my standard
of practice.

(2) I, Dr. Smith, acknowledge that the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
(the “ICR Committee”) referred allegations of professional misconduct and
incompetence to the Discipline Committee in a Notice of Hearing dated
September 10, 2014 and May 12, 2015 (the “Notice of Hearing”).

(3) I, Dr. Smith, acknowledge and agree that, in exchange for me providing an
original copy of this Undertaking as signed by me, the College has agreed to
withdraw the Notice of Hearing.

(4) I, Dr. Smith, acknowledge that this Undertaking replaces all other undertakings I
have made to the College, including the undertakings dated February 24, 2011,
October 14, 2014, and March 22, 2015.

B. UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT

(5) I, Dr. Smith, hereby resign from the College effective August 10, 2015 (the
“Effective Date”).

(6) I, Dr. Smith, hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a
physician to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after the


Effective Date.

(7) I, Dr. Smith, agree that in the event that the College should become aware that I
am in breach of this Undertaking including, but not limited to, becoming aware
that I have either applied, re-applied or attempted to apply or re-apply for
registration as a physician or for a certificate of registration, or equivalent, to
practise medicine in any jurisdiction after the Effective Date, the College shall, in
its sole discretion, have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the
basis of a breach of this Undertaking and shall have the right to proceed with the
specified allegations set out in the Notice of Hearing.

(8) I, Dr. Smith, hereby agree to bear the risk of any prejudice that the passage of
time might cause to my ability to make full answer and defence, and waive the
right to seek any remedy on the basis of the passage of time, should the College
proceed with any allegations that may arise as a result of a breach of this
Undertaking and/or pursuant to paragraph (7) above.

(9) I, Dr. Smith, undertake to the College to abide by the terms of the College’s
Policy on Practice Management Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to
Practise, Take an Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their Practice Due to
Relocation, a copy of which is attached hereto as Appendix “A”.

(10) I, Dr. Smith, undertake to the College that upon signing this Undertaking, I shall
forward a request to the General Manager of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
(“OHIP”) that my billing number be deactivated for services rendered after the
Effective Date.

(11) I, Dr. Smith, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all
fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc., if any, arising from the implementation of any
of the terms of this Undertaking.

(12) I, Dr. Smith, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the terms
and conditions provided in this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent
legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
right to do so.

(13) I, Dr. Smith, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate
enquiries of OHIP and/or any person or institution who may have relevant
information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the terms of


this Undertaking.

(14) I, Dr. Smith, consent to the terms of this Undertaking being entered on the
register as information that is available to the public.


Source: Member
Active Date: October 14, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Donald Harland Smith to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Membership Services Department):


A. PREAMBLE

(1) I, Dr. Smith, certificate of registration number 13826, am a member of the College.

(2) I have read both the Notice of Hearing into allegations of professional misconduct and incompetence against me and the materials the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee was considering under s. 37 of the Health Professions Procedural Code. I am aware of the College’s concern about protecting the public.

(3) I understand and agree that I am bound by the terms of this Undertaking from the date on which I sign it.

B. UNDERTAKING

(4) I undertake to inform the College of each and every location that I practise including, but not limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively my “Practice Location(s)”), within 15 days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within 15 days of commencing practice at that location.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(8) I acknowledge that this Undertaking will be effective until the allegations of professional misconduct and incompetence against me have been finally disposed of by the Discipline Committee.


(9) I acknowledge and agree that, in the event of an appeal of any Order of the Discipline Committee, if the Discipline Committee has directed the Registrar to revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my certificate of registration, that Order will take effect immediately despite any appeal.


D. CONSENT

(14) I consent to the terms of this undertaking being entered on the register as information that is available to the public.