Smith, Douglas Wayne (CPSO#: 75969)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Smith & Aubry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 16 2007

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may submit their request by email to: drdouglassmithottawa@gmail.com.
Date Received: 24 Feb 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2017