Smith, Edward Robert (CPSO#: 71022)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 31 Mar 1997 to 02 May 1997
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 May 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2002