Smith, Eileen Marguerite (CPSO#: 52393)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Oct 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
250 Harding Boulevard West
Suite 404
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone: (905) 737-9898
Fax: (905) 737-8583
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Freedman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Smith ( CPSO# 52393 )
Dr. J. Freedman ( CPSO# 58403 )

Business Address:
509 Park Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 1N9
Phone Number: (519) 746-1919

Business Address:
404 - 250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 737-9898

Business Address:
146 Wyndham Street North
Guelph ON  N1M 4E8
Phone Number: (519) 822-6100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 09 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EILEEN MARGUERITE SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1987