Smith, Eric John (CPSO#: 61188)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 28 Oct 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Oct 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Mar 2013 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 10 Nov 2014 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1990
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Oct 1992