Smith, Erin Elizabeth (CPSO#: 89425)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CFEME
1133 Sheppard Ave W
Toronto, ON
M3K2C9
Toronto ON  M5V3T1
Phone: 416-635-2021
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIN ELIZABETH SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2013