Smith, Erin Sara (CPSO#: 71065)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: Golini, Erin Sara (used until: 13 Sep 1998 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Care Clinic
1385 Bank Street, Suite 100
Ottawa ON  K1H 8N4
Phone: 613-523-7440 Ext. 3
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIN SARA SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Oct 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 1998 to 30 Apr 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 May 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2000