Smith, Faye Evelyn (CPSO#: 60878)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 29 Nov 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Nov 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1991
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 29 Nov 1996