Smith, Frank Astor (CPSO#: 19982)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Frank Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 30 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 12 Mar 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1966
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 16 Apr 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jul 2016