Smith, Frank Charles (CPSO#: 28172)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 May 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 May 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bristol, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3-149B
3350 Fairview Street
Burlington ON  L7N 3L5
Phone: (289) 337-1920
Fax: (289) 337-8323
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Frank C. Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Smith ( CPSO# 28172 )

Business Address:
Suite 3-149B
3350 Fairview Street
Burlington ON  L7N 3L5
Phone Number: (289) 337-1920

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Grand Cayman

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANK CHARLES SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1976