Smith, Gerald Dixon (CPSO#: 22635)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 13 Mar 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Mar 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1970
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 13 Mar 2006

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 Sep 2003
Summary:

 On December 1, 2003, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario 
 found that Dr. Gerald Dixon Smith committed acts of professional misconduct including sexual 
 impropriety with a patient, failing to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and 
 conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
 circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional.

The Discipline Committee directed that Dr. Smith(s certificate of registration be 
 revoked immediately, effective January 20, 2004.  On January 21, 2004, Dr. Smith appealed to the 
 Divisional Court.  Pursuant to subsection 25(1) of the Statutory Powers Procedures Act, the 
 decision of the Discipline Committee was stayed pending the outcome of the appeal.    

On March 
 13, 2006, the Divisional Court dismissed Dr. Smith(s appeal.

Therefore, Dr. Smith(s certificate 
 of registration in the Province of Ontario is revoked effective March 13, 2006 at 11:59 p.m.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 13 Mar 2006
Hearing Date(s): Dec 16, 2002