Smith, Graeme Neil (CPSO#: 65616)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Obstetrics
and Gynaecology
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-2405
Fax: (613) 548-1330
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Graeme Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Smith ( CPSO# 65616 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Obstetrics and Gynecology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 484-8715

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRAEME NEIL SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1998