Smith, Gregory Lewis George (CPSO#: 28714)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1976
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Jan 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 17 Dec 2007
Summary:

 On December 17, 2007, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario 
 found that Dr. Smith committed acts of professional misconduct in that he has been found guilty of 
 an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise, and that he engaged in conduct or an 
 act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, 
 would reasonably be regarded by m embers as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  The 
 Discipline Committee directed the following:


1)        That the Registrar to suspend Dr. Smith(s 
 certificate of registration for a period of five (5) 	months, effective January 1, 2008, the last 
 month to be suspended if Dr. Smith successfully completes, at his own expense, the College(s 
 Medical Ethics and Informed Consent course within four (4) months of  the date of this Order, and 
 provides proof thereof to the College;

 2)       That Dr. Smith(s OHIP billings be monitored by a 
 licensed physician, acceptable to the 	College and at Dr. Smith(s expense, for the next two (2) 
 years, commencing on the date the suspension outlined in paragraph 3 ends.  The monitoring shall 
 take place monthly for the first year and bimonthly for the second year.  The monitor shall report 
 to the College on a quarterly basis or sooner if his/her review has detected items of concern.

 
 3)       That Dr. Smith to pay to the College costs in the amount of $3,650.00 within 60 days of 
 	the date of this Order.

 4)         That the results of this proceeding to be included in the 
 register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Dec 17, 2007