Smith, Ira Alexander (CPSO#: 72759)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
David L. MacIntosh Clinic
100 Devonshire Place - 4th Floor
University of Toronto
Toronto ON  M5S 2C9
Phone: (416) 978-4678
Fax: (416) 971-2846
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

150 Eglinton Avenue E - 5th floor
Toronto ON  M4P 1E8
Canada
Phone: (416) 481-1601
Fax: (416) 481-1267
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ira Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 06 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Smith ( CPSO# 72759 )

Business Address:
University of Toronto
David L. MacIntosh Clinic
4rth Floor
100 Devonshire Place
Toronto ON  M5S 2C9
Phone Number: (416) 978-4678

Business Address:
5th Floor
150 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1E8
Phone Number: (416) 481-1601

Business Address:
7th Floor
720 King Street West
Toronto ON  M5V 2T3
Phone Number: (416) 963-9338

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IRA ALEXANDER SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2000