Smith, John Douglas (CPSO#: 18877)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 25 Oct 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Oct 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 27 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Aug 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1977
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Oct 1999