Smith, John Robert (CPSO#: 56994)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
1280 Main Street West
2F43
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 320-7750
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John R. Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Thompson ( CPSO# 56996 )
Dr. J. Smith ( CPSO# 56994 )

Business Address:
McMaster University
Unit 2F43
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 525-9140

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN ROBERT SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1989