Smith, Julia Ann (CPSO#: 68211)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577 Ext. 52201
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Julia A. Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Smith ( CPSO# 68211 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIA ANN SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999