Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Smith, Kevin David (CPSO#: 59236)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Mar 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Mar 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2148 Carling Avenue
Suite 205
Ottawa ON  K2A 1H1
Phone: (613) 596-0300
Fax: (613) 596-0848
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin David Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Smith ( CPSO# 59236 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
2148 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 1H1
Phone Number: (613) 596-0300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 19 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN DAVID SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 1988