Smith, Kevin Frederick (CPSO#: 74262)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Mar 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 20 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1999 to 29 Feb 2000
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2000 to 31 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 May 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Mar 2014