Smith, Lloyd Colin (CPSO#: 52717)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Suite 1W-103
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6618
Fax: (416) 756-6621
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lloyd Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Smith ( CPSO# 52717 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Suite 1W-103
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6618

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 14 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LLOYD COLIN SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1988