Smith, Marcia Clara (CPSO#: 16267)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Sep 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1957
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Mar 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Sep 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Sep 1993