Smith, Marian Heather (CPSO#: 55588)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 06 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jul 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jun 2002