Smith, Nancy Isabel (CPSO#: 23230)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard D. Merritt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 9 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 06 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011