Smith, Oakley David (CPSO#: 51791)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2349 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M4E 1H2
Phone: (416) 465-5795
Fax: (416) 465-5701
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Oakley Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Smith ( CPSO# 51791 )

Business Address:
2349 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M4E 1H2
Phone Number: (416) 465-5795

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 09 Sep 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OAKLEY DAVID SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1986