Smith, Patricia Lee (CPSO#: 88538)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
2409 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 2E7
Phone: (416) 482-8880
Fax: (416) 482-8881
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Crossways Clinic
2340 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 392-0999
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA LEE SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010