Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Smith, Robert Alexander (CPSO#: 59944)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Oct 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: 705-929-4506
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deborah and Robert Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Smith ( CPSO# 59409 )
Dr. R. Smith ( CPSO# 59944 )

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 09 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT ALEXANDER SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1992