Smith, Robert Lewis (CPSO#: 15820)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 13 Nov 1963 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1956
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1959
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jun 2001