Smith, Sean Robinson (CPSO#: 81693)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of the West Indies, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 31 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 13 Sep 2004
PEAP - Resident - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2004 to 13 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2005 to 13 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2006 to 13 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 13 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2008 to 13 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010