Smith, Selwyn Michael (CPSO#: 42184)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jun 1998

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Sydney, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jun 1998

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 18 Oct 1993
Summary:

 In October 1993, Dr. Smith pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 
 60(3)(a) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended, in that he was found guilty of an 
 offence relevant to his suitability to practice.  The Discipline Committee accepted this plea and 
 found Dr. Smith guilty of professional misconduct.  The Committee also accepted a joint submission 
 as to penalty, consequently ordering that Dr. Smith be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand 
 to be recorded on the Register, and it recommended that his name be published.  The Committee also 
 ruled that Dr. Smith be fined the sum of $5000.00, and that his licence to practice be suspended 
 for a period of three months.  This suspension was itself to be suspended, however, provided that, 
 in relation to his practice of medicine, Dr. Smith not act as a trustee or otherwise be 
 responsible for the management of money belonging to other members for a period of two years.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 18 Oct 1993