Smith, Sharyn Joyanne (CPSO#: 63602)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stratford General Hospital
Department of Pathology
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone: (519) 272-8210 Ext. 2518
Fax: (519) 272-8198
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARYN JOYANNE SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1992