Smith, Stacy Elaine (CPSO#: 67012)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998