Smith, Stanley Godfrey (CPSO#: 71856)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stanley G. Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 8 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1971 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014