Smith, Stuart John (CPSO#: 56998)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Cardiology , Rm C6-118
London Health Sciences Centre-
University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd.
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3428
Fax: (519) 663-3764
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stuart John Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Smith ( CPSO# 56998 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre-University Hospital
Division of Cardiology
Suite C6-118 UH
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3428

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 25 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STUART JOHN SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1988