Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Smith, Terry Sidney (CPSO#: 60050)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Apr 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Critical Care Medicine
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
D108
2075 Bayview Avenue
North York ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4522
Fax: (416) 480-4999
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Terry S Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Smith ( CPSO# 60050 )

Business Address:
Dept of Critical Care Medicine
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
D108
2075 Bayview Avenue
North York ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4522

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 22 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TERRY SIDNEY SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 1991