Smith, Vivien Anne (CPSO#: 22909)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1
110 Lowther Avenue
Toronto ON  M5R 1E3
Phone: 4165193685
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vivien Anne Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 12 2007


Corporation Name: Vivien Anne Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 18 2008


Corporation Name: Vivien Anne Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 11 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Smith ( CPSO# 22909 )

Business Address:
Suite 1
110 Lowther Avenue
Toronto ON  M5R 1E3
Phone Number: (416) 519-3685

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIVIEN ANNE SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1970
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2009