Smith, William Gary (CPSO#: 26277)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 07 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Sep 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jul 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jul 1996