Smith, William Gary (CPSO#: 28616)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone: (705) 267-6370
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. W. Gary Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Smith ( CPSO# 28616 )

Business Address:
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone Number: (705) 267-6370

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 22 May 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM GARY SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1980