Smoling, Leslie Frank (CPSO#: 18357)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 29 Sep 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Indicates a concern or additional information


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Hungarian, Italian

Education:University of Sciences,Budapest, 1952

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1962
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Jun 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 1981
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 29 Sep 1993

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 29 Sep 1993

 In September 1993, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Smoling guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 29(22) of Ontario Regulation 548/90, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the 
 standard of practice of the profession.  The Committee further found Dr. Smoling incompetent, as 
 defined in s. 61(4) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1990, as amended, in that he displayed in his 
 professional care of a patient a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment or disregard for the welfare 
 of the patient of a nature or to an extent that demonstrates he is unfit to continue in practice.  
 Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Smoling's licence to practice be revoked.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 17 Aug 1995
Hearing Date(s): 25 Aug 1993