Smolkin, Mark Andrew (CPSO#: 63693)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 708
1243 Islington Avenue
Toronto ON  M8X 1Y9
Phone: (416) 944-8431
Fax: (416) 944-8432
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Travel Medicine On Bloor
Suite 708
1243 Islington Avenue
Toronto ON  M8X 1Y9
Canada
Phone: (416) 213-1266
Fax: (416) 944-8432
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Runnymede Healthcare Centre
625 Runnymede Road
Toronto ON  M6S 3A3
Canada
Phone: (416) 762-7316
Fax: (416) 762-3836
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tao Smolkin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Tao ( CPSO# 66743 )
Dr. M. Smolkin ( CPSO# 63693 )

Business Address:
625 Runnymade Road
Toronto ON  M6S 3A3

Business Address:
708 - 1243 Islington Avenue
Toronto ON  M8X 1Y9
Phone Number: (416) 922-6897

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Runnymede Healthcare Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK ANDREW SMOLKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMOLKIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1992