Smuczek, Joseph Anthony (CPSO#: 92024)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital Site
2200 Eglinton Avenue East
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: 905-813-2200
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jan 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH ANTHONY SMUCZEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMUCZEK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2012